Accounts and annual returns CRUSADER HALL

Charity number: 253811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2024 02 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2023 22 February 2024 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2022 22 February 2024 478 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2021 08 March 2022 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2020 18 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 Not Required