CRUSADER HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a venue for Christian and sporting activities mostly for young people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Surrey
- Sutton
Governance
- 18 October 1967: Standard registration
- WALLINGTON CRUSADER HALL (Working name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Brian Reeves | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
michael james carpenter | Trustee | 14 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT VERNON HEDDERLY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.64k | £6.32k | £15.35k | £15.35k | £17.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.50k | £5.50k | £5.05k | £5.05k | £7.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 22 February 2024 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 22 February 2024 | 478 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 20TH MAY 1925
Charitable objects
TO BE USED FOR ALL OR ANY OF THE PURPOSES OF THE WALLINGTON CRUSADERS' BIBLE CLASS FOR PUBLIC AND PRIVATE SCHOOLBOYS AND YOUNG MEN IN SUCH MANNER AS THE LEADER OF LEARDERS FOR THE TIME BEING THEREOF SHALL THINK FIT WITHIN THE LIMITS OF THE TRUSTS HEREINAFTER DECLARED AND SUBJECT TO SUCH TERMS AND OBLIGATIONS AS MAY BE AGREED BETWEEN THE TRUSTEES AND THE WALLINGTON CRUSADERS' BIBLE CLASS AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
WALLINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
176 Riddlesdown Road
Purley
Greater London
England
CR8 1DF
- Phone:
- 07973112090
- Email:
- MJCARPENTER68@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window