Accounts and annual returns CANNOCK AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 253866
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2008 06 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 06 November 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 22 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 21 November 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 09 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 12 October 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 16 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 16 September 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 26 August 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 26 August 2004 On Time