Financial history CANNOCK AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 253866
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 30/09/2008
Total gross income £180.40k £183.00k £185.64k £203.47k £218.21k
Total expenditure £190.48k £179.95k £187.54k £199.36k £198.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A