THE STRATEGIC PLANNING SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the practice and understanding of strategy in all organisations. To provide information via publications, the web and networking opportunities and to encourage the dissemination of new ideas through all its activities. The Society is a non profit distributing organisation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 November 1968: Standard registration
- 23 February 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SPS (Working name)
- STRATEGIC PLANNING SOCIETY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.17k | £38.43k | £33.91k | £27.86k | £22.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.70k | £27.90k | £21.64k | £22.31k | £28.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 04 September 2019 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
M AND A OF ASSOC. INC. 13/01/1967, AMENDED BY SPEC. RES. 20/02/1967, 13/05/1968, 04/11/1968, 01/06/1970, 14/06/1976, 22/09/1981, 27/09/1982, 24/09/1984, 20/12/1985 AND 28/09/1988.
Charitable objects
TO STUDY DEVELOP AND TEACH THE PRINCIPLES AND TECHNIQUES WHICH ARE OF GENERAL APPLICATION IN THE FORMULATION AND USE OF LONG RANGE PLANS AND THE METHODS BY WHICH SUCH PRINCIPLES AND TECHNIQUES CAN BE APPLIED TO LONG RANGE PLANNING IN GOVERNMENT INDUSTRY BUSINESS AND OTHER ORGANISED ACTIVITIES. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window