THE TONBRIDGE PHILHARMONIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's principal objects are the study and practice of choral and orchestral music for the enhancement of musical satisfaction in order to foster public knowledge and appreciation of such music by means of public performance. These objectives are achieved through the performance of public concerts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 24 November 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathryn Mary Howlett | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patrick James Glencross | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Graham Urquhart | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Edward Bignell | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Mary Willoughby | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Mace | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Dearsley | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Robert Skone James | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS ROSIE SERPIS | Trustee | 03 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.04k | £45.33k | £7.19k | £48.90k | £49.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.92k | £35.22k | £13.71k | £48.61k | £49.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 19 JUNE 1967, 20 JULY 1978, 15 JULY 1998, 3 JULY 2002, 18 JUNE 2003 , 9 JULY 2003 AND 28 NOVEMBER 2005.. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 06 APR 2016 as amended on 27 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Broad Oak
Brenchley
TONBRIDGE
Kent
TN12 7NN
- Phone:
- 07861124293
- Email:
- secretary@tonphil.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window