THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF GLASS SELLERS CHARITY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donating monies to individuals, and charities associated with the glass industry or with a connection with London. Donations to schools and other educational organisations to promote glass and STEM.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 November 1967: Standard registration
- THE GLASS SELLERS COMPANY' CHARITY FUND (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR JOHN ROBERT WHITEMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Richard Gundle | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
JING AARONS | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Holford | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Frederick Reid | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Paul Wenham | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
LEIGH BAILDHAM | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.44k | £48.89k | £62.40k | £73.12k | £87.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.43k | £9.96k | £34.48k | £65.43k | £49.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 06 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 06 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20TH SEPTEMBER 1967 as amended on 18 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
238 Nelson Road
Whitton
TW2 7WB
- Phone:
- 07596 418127
- Email:
- charity@glass-sellers.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window