LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF ABERYSTWYTH HOSPITALS AND WELFARE HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To work for the welfare of the patients and staff of Bronglais Hospital, Aberystwyth and the Community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Ceredigion
Governance
- 30 June 1969: Standard registration
- CYNRHAIR CYFEILLION YSBYTY BRONGLAIS A'R CYMUNED (Working name)
- CYNRHAIR CYFEILLION YSBYTY BRONGLAIS A'R CYMYMED (Working name)
- LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF BRONGLAIS HOSPITAL AND COMMUNITY (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elinor Powell | Chair | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Foale | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rhian Elisabeth Davies | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.49k | £16.36k | £6.10k | £19.97k | £14.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.73k | £67.08k | £5.04k | £5.36k | £12.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 March 2022 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND JUNE 1969
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE ABERYSTWYTH HOSPITALS WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND, GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITALS.
Area of benefit
ABERYSTWYTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Clos Winifred
BORTH
Ceredigion
SY24 5LE
- Phone:
- 07773785734
- Email:
- bronglaisfriends@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window