THE INDEPENDENT METHODIST ASSOCIATION (INCORPORATED)

Charity number: 254007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote Evangelical Religion in the United Kingdom and in all or any other parts of the world according to the principles and usages for the time being of Protestants of the Denomination known as Independent Methodists.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £285,142
Total expenditure: £457,222

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 January 2000: Standard registration
  • 28 October 2013: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Graham Thomas Edmondson Trustee 30 November 2024
None on record
Christopher William Woodall Trustee 29 August 2024
ROE GREEN CHURCH
Received: 14 days late
Pauline Wendy Smith Trustee 28 July 2024
BETHEL INDEPENDENT METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
DAVID WILLIAM HUGHES Trustee 28 October 2023
ATHERTON & LEIGH FOODBANK
Received: On time
Kay Louise White Trustee 30 July 2022
EASINGTON LANE COMMUNITY ACCESS POINT
Received: On time
NORTH EAST CIRCUIT OF INDEPENDENT METHODIST CHURCHES
Recently registered
Carrie Elizabeth Louise O'Nions Trustee 30 July 2022
None on record
DEBORAH CARON ROBERTS Trustee 05 February 2022
DOWNALL GREEN INDEPENDENT METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Alan Britton Trustee 16 October 2021
WARRINGTON YOUTH FOR CHRIST
Received: On time
WARRINGTON YOUTH FOR CHRIST
Recently registered
Roger Stone Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
DOROTHY LYDIA KENDRICK Trustee 04 August 2019
ROMAN ROAD INDEPENDENT METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
ALISON TIPPING Trustee 29 July 2018
ROMAN ROAD INDEPENDENT METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Matthew Long Trustee 31 July 2016
None on record
Ada Loraine Ann Cheers Trustee 25 July 2015
None on record
LEESA KAY CROCKATT Trustee 27 July 2014
None on record
RITA GREEN-PRESCOTT Trustee 02 October 2012
None on record
NORMAN HARRY PRESCOTT Trustee
LAMBERHEAD GREEN INDEPENDENT METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Shaun Newton Trustee
HETTON COLLIERY RAILWAY 200
Received: On time
VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS' NETWORK NORTH EAST
Received: On time
NORTH EAST CIRCUIT OF INDEPENDENT METHODIST CHURCHES
Recently registered
HETTON-LE-HOLE INDEPENDENT METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
MARILYN MAY RIDING Trustee
DOWNALL GREEN INDEPENDENT METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
BRIAN ALAN ROWNEY Trustee
ASTLEY INDEPENDENT METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
WILLIAM HAMPSON Trustee
LOWTON INDEPENDENT METHODIST CHURCH TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNEXION THEREWITH
Received: On time
CROSSROADS GLOBAL VILLAGE (UK)
Received: On time
LEONARD OGILVIE Trustee
BOLDON COLLIERY INDEPENDENT METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £108.36k £85.17k £134.49k £469.69k £285.14k
Total expenditure £568.94k £205.50k £273.72k £225.05k £457.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 05 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 15 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 14 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
RULES ADOPTED JUNE 1938
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE USED IN MAKING GRANTS TO NEW CAUSES IN CONNECTION WITH OR INTENDED TO BE CONNECTED WITH THE INDEPENDENT METHODIST CHURCHES TO SPREAD THE PRINCIPLES OF SUCH CHURCHES AND TO ASSIST CHURCHES AND MISSIONS TO REDUCE DEBTS OR EXTEND PREMISES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 12 January 2000 : Standard registration
  • 28 October 2013 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
Independent Methodist Churches
The Resource Centre
Fleet Street
WIGAN
Lancashire
WN5 0DS
Phone:
01942223526
Website:

imchurches.org.uk