NURSES HOME FUND

Charity number: 254014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Financial assistance for chronically sick and disabled people

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,322
Total expenditure: £1,193

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 March 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DIANA MORRIS Chair
FROME RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITIES
Received: On time
Diane Ellis Trustee 11 June 2024
FROME RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITIES
Received: On time
Gillian Ann Taylor Trustee 06 June 2023
None on record
FRANK GEOFFREY COLLINS Trustee 07 October 2022
FROME LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Received: On time
COLLINS EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE RICHARD OATLEY TRUST NUMBER 2
Received: On time
KENNETH MAURICE WILLIAMS WILL TRUST
Received: On time
FROME RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITIES
Received: On time
Justine Alford Trustee 02 October 2018
FROME RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITIES
Received: On time
Ann Hobbs Trustee 19 September 2017
None on record
Mark Symes Trustee 14 August 2017
FROME RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITIES
Received: On time
LIONS CLUBS INTERNATIONAL DISTRICT 105SW FOUNDATION (CIO)
Received: On time
FROME LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Received: On time
JUDY ZILLA HOSEGOOD Trustee 27 January 2012
None on record
MR TONY PERRY Trustee
FROME RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITIES
Received: On time
FROME AND DISTRICT MENCAP SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, FROME
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.21k £1.23k £1.27k £1.41k £1.32k
Total expenditure £1.91k £610 £1.24k £2.38k £1.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 April 2024 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
20 Wellow Drive
FROME
BA11 2DU
Phone:
01373467844
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available