CHARITY OF THOMAS BENSON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Distributing gifts to the sick and those in need residing in the Parish of St. Cuthbert with St Mary, Carlisle or on the electoral role of St Cuthbert with Mary's Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cumbria
Governance
- 25 October 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fergus Craig Culley | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Dawson | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Irene Roberts-Green | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £16 | £0 | £98 | £392 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £100 | £130 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 February 2024 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL AND CODICIL PROVED AT CARLISLE ON 16TH JANUARY 1826
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF SUCH OF THE MOST INDIGENT AND DISTRESSED POOR IN THE PARISHES OF ST. MARY AND ST. CUTHBERT AS THE TRUSTEES SHOULD DEEM MOST DESERVING.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISHES OF ST. MARY AND ST. CUTHBERT CARLISLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Eden Grange
Little Corby
Carlisle
Cumbria
CA4 8QW
- Phone:
- 01228562508
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window