THE CARROLL TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious. To provide funds for the upkeep of the fabric and fittings of St Cuthbert's Church Castle Vale Birmingham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 14 November 1967: Standard registration
- SHILLING A WEEK FUND (Working name)
- CASTLE VALE CHURCH SHILLING A WEEK FIVE YEAR FUND (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JAMES BRIAN ANDREW COPE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Margaret Ita Wheatley | Trustee | 16 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
James Roger Caleb | Trustee | 16 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
SALLY FRANCIS REES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA ROUND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNETTE CHRISTINE CALEB | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.77k | £3.91k | £4.00k | £4.44k | £4.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.12k | £928 | £240 | £240 | £1.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES DATED 1 MAY 1967 AS AMENDED 15 OCTOBER 1986, 15 OCTOBER 1992 AND 27TH AUGUST 2000.
Charitable objects
TO COLLECT SUMS OF MONEY FOR INVESTMENT, THE INCOME TO BE USED TOWARDS ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY LIVING IN OR AROUND CASTLE VALE NEAR BIRMINGHAM:- (I) BUILDING, AND FURNISHING A CHURCH. (II) BUILDING, AND FURNISHING A HALL WITH OR WITHOUT ANCILLARY ROOMS. (III) MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC AND FURNISHINGS OF THE BEFORE MENTIONED BUILDINGS.
Area of benefit
IN OR AROUND CASTLE VALE NEAR BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 ASHVILLE AVENUE
BIRMINGHAM
B34 6NA
- Phone:
- 01217472397
- Email:
- a.caleb@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window