CHARLESWORTH WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Womens Institute is a democratically controlled educational & social organisationfor women, offering the opportunityfor working & learning together to improve the quality of life in the community. It is a forum for lobbying on all kinds of issues at a local, national & International level.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 25 October 1967: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Holt | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Penny Saunders | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Davenport | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Morris | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Boddy | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.30k | £4.30k | £1.55k | £4.48k | £4.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.11k | £4.11k | £1.90k | £3.50k | £3.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 05 December 2024 | 280 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES
Charitable objects
The objects of the WI are to further the purposes of the Women’s Institute organisation
Area of benefit
CHARLESWORTH AND CHISWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SECRETARY
CHARLESWORTH WI
DFWI DERBYSHIRE HOUSE
SHERWIN STREET
DERBY
DE2 2GP
- Phone:
- 01332342596
- Email:
- kinderjudith@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window