Governing document NATIONAL DAHLIA SOCIETY
Charity number: 254049

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 FEBRUARY 1967 AS AMENDED 18 MARCH 1982, MARCH 1987, MARCH 1998, 16 MARCH 2003, 7 MARCH 2004, 6 MARCH 2005, 11 MARCH 2007 AND 2 MARCH 2008. as amended on 17 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY ARE TO ENCOURAGE IMPROVE AND EXTEND THE CULTIVATION OF THE DAHLIA BY MEANS OF PUBLICATIONS, THE HOLDING OF EXHIBITIONS, JUDGING EXAMINATIONS, CONFERENCES, LECTURES, TRIALS OR ANY OTHER MEANS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NATIONAL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.