HICKSON'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 254065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of housing (almshouses)

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £16,037
Total expenditure: £11,853

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 December 1969: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BARKSTON CHARITIES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN A JACKSON Chair 07 October 2019
None on record
ALAN CARD Trustee 07 October 2019
None on record
MARYAN NUSSEY Trustee 07 October 2019
GRANTHAM MUSIC CLUB
Received: On time
ALAN LESLIE JAMES ROWELL Trustee 07 October 2019
BARKSTON VILLAGE WAR MEMORIAL REPAIR FUND
Received: On time
Rev Stuart Hadley Trustee 07 October 2019
BAYARD'S LEAP SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Georgie Machell Trustee 07 October 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £15.28k £15.49k £15.71k £15.98k £16.04k
Total expenditure £15.73k £9.28k £13.32k £15.99k £11.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE 25TH JULY 1969 AS AMENDED ON 04 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
1) ONE THIRD TOWARDS THE REPAIR OF THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS, BARKSTON. 2) ONE THIRD FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BARKSTON. 3) RELIEF IN NEED.ONE THIRD OF THE INCOME TO BE APPLIED TO A CHARITY SERVING THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN SOUTH WEST LINCOLNSHIRE
Area of benefit
BARKSTON
Registration history
  • 13 December 1969 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
10 THE LEAS
BARKSTON
GRANTHAM
NG32 2PD
Phone:
01400250606
Website:

No information available