CHARITY OF FRANCIS STALEY FOR NURSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Charity is to relieve in cases of need persons resident in Tansley who are sick, convalescent, disabled, handicapped or infirm.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 16 July 1969: Standard registration
- FRANCIS STALEY (MEDICAL) TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARGARET STRANGE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Briavel Gregory | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
JUNE ELIZABETH GREATOREX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFFREY ALAN CRAPPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN STRANGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £352 | £410 | £57 | £150 | £70 | |
|
Total expenditure | £160 | £278 | £302 | £0 | £370 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 23RD APRIL 1969
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED PERSONS RESIDENT IN TANSLEY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM.
Area of benefit
TANSLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 The Knoll
Tansley
Matlock
Derbyshire
DE4 5FP
- Phone:
- 07385294915
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window