YAPHAM POORS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purposes of the charity are to make grants where considered appropriate by the Trustees (1) to parishioners of Yapham cum Meltonby in receipt of the state pension for the relief of need, and (2) to parishioners with children in full time education and living in the parish for the benefit of their child's/children's education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 08 December 1967: Standard registration
- YAPHAM VILLAGE CHARITY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Gray | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Ackerley | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARK SISSONS | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
KELLY DUNCAN | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY BARKER | Trustee | 13 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANET DANBY | Trustee | 09 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
DIANA BARNES | Trustee | 09 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MARGARET HUTCHINSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £226 | £324 | £134 | £103 | £119 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £490 | £240 | £75 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME UNDER THE ENDOWED SCHOOLS ACTS OF 9 AUGUST 1872 IN CONJUNCTION WITH SCHEME OF 17 APRIL 1863 AS AMENDED BY DECLARATION UNDER S 74C OF 22 NOVEMBER 2008 as amended on 20 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE INCOME TO BE APPLIED TO MAKE GRANTS WHERE CONSIDERED APPROPRIATE BY THE TRUSTEES (1) TO PARISHIONERS OF YAPHAM-CUM-MELTONBY IN RECEIPT OF THE STATE PENSION FOR THE RELIEF OF NEED AND (2) TO PARISHIONERS WITH CHILDREN IN FULL TIME EDUCATION AND LIVING IN THE PARISH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THEIR CHILD'S/CHILDREN'S EDUCATION
Area of benefit
CHAPELRY OF YAPHAM-CUM-MELTONBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Stables
Millington Road
Kilnwick Percy
Pocklington
York
YO42 1UF
- Phone:
- 01759302727
- Email:
- john@yorkshiremaps.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window