AGE CONCERN, BANBURY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Age Concern (Banbury) primarily exists to serve the elderly folk of Banbury and District by providing counselling services and transport with its two minibuses. These serve a day centre run by Anchor Trust, and various groups of "pensioners" on a daily basis. All drivers are volunteers and are only reimbursed travelling expenses to and from their homes to the minibus parking area in Banbury.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 07 November 1967: Standard registration
- 07 April 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 07 April 2009: Funds transferred to 1091529 AGE UK OXFORDSHIRE
- BANBURY OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.85k | £18.42k | £20.16k | £22.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.50k | £11.52k | £11.79k | £33.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 24 September 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | 12 November 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 15 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | 22 November 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 22 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | 22 December 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | 26 November 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | 26 November 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED THE 16TH JUNE 1966 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15TH APRIL 1991.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF BANBURY (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT").
Area of benefit
BANBURY AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window