BISHOP HALL'S NORTHFIELD TRUST

Charity Number: 254253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grants of Complete Bibles, any version, any language, within the UK

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 May 2024

Total income: £13,451
Total expenditure: £8,520

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Coventry City
  • Dudley
  • Sandwell
  • Solihull
  • Walsall
  • Wolverhampton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 November 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BISHOP HALLS CHARITY FOR BIBLES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KEITH UFF Trustee 08 May 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. GEORGE'S CHURCH, EDGBASTON, BIRMINGHAM
Received: On time
Rev Amanda Featherstone Trustee 17 May 2023
THE KING'S NORTON UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Rev Pam McKellen Trustee 17 May 2023
None on record
REV TIM DAVIS Trustee 17 May 2017
None on record
Rev Dylis Jones Trustee 20 May 2015
None on record
Rev Richard Martin Clark Trustee 21 May 2014
ST LAWRENCE PRE SCHOOL (NORTH WINGFIELD)
Received: On time
CHERISH FUND
Received: On time
Redditch Youth for Christ
Received: On time
Rev Neville Pugh Trustee 09 December 2011
None on record
Charles Aston Milward Trustee
LAMPS COLLECTIVE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/05/2020 01/05/2021 01/05/2022 01/05/2023 01/05/2024
Total gross income £4.61k £3.90k £4.32k £4.82k £13.45k
Total expenditure £1.96k £3.69k £3.88k £3.01k £8.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 May 2024 29 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2023 03 July 2024 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2022 18 April 2023 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2021 13 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2020 14 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
70A Copt Elm Road
Charlton Kings
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL53 8AW
Phone:
01527543967
Website:

No information available