THE CHURCH ESTATE

Charity number: 254296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

As detailed in the 1909 Scheme

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £95,880
Total expenditure: £74,354

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 December 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PATTINGHAM CHURCH ESTATE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS C M RINGROSE Chair
None on record
Dorothy Margaret Steel Trustee 30 June 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CHAD, PATTINGHAM WITH ST MARY, PATSHULL
Received: On time
CHARITY OF JANE CARTWRIGHT
Received: On time
Clive Edward Alexander Pendrell Trustee 11 October 2020
None on record
DAVID SAMPSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £78.96k £83.18k £89.17k £93.44k £95.88k
Total expenditure £28.24k £25.13k £26.29k £33.24k £74.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 20 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 09 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 02 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 17 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 28 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 28 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 29 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 07 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 16 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 19 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE RIDGES
GREAT MOOR ROAD
PATTINGHAM
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV6 7AU
Phone:
01902700340
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available