TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH THE ENGLISH PROVINCE OF THE CONGREGATION OF CHRISTIAN BROTHERS

Charity number: 254312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To support the religious and other charitable works carried on in the name of the Trust and to care for the members of the Congregation. These Ministries of the Brothers of the Congregation, all of which benefit numerous members of the general public, fall into the following main areas: Education / Faith Development / Social and pastoral work / International missionary work

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Liverpool City
  • Salford City
  • Stoke-on-trent City
  • Trafford
  • Wirral

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 August 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • CONGREGATION OF CHRISTIAN BROTHERS (Working name)
  • CONGREGATION OF CHRISTIAN BROTHERS TRUSTEES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Br Jim Donovan Trustee 30 June 2022
None on record
Brother David Gibson Trustee 02 July 2020
None on record
BROTHER DOMINIC SASSI Trustee 05 May 2014
None on record
BROTHER PATRICK GEORGE GORDON Trustee
None on record
BROTHER EAMON O'BRIEN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £4.24m £3.50m £2.21m £2.31m £2.16m
Total expenditure £6.00m £5.56m £3.11m £2.94m £3.02m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £14.90k £45.57k £12.01k £30.03k £3.10k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.72m £2.62m £1.52m £1.74m £1.76m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £171.84k £406.45k £213.55k £209.92k £71.02k
Income - Other £328.94k £426.06k £465.08k £338.24k £322.06k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.96m £5.53m £3.08m £2.91m £2.99m
Expenditure - Raising funds £35.45k £30.30k £33.92k £35.82k £30.13k
Expenditure - Governance £639.41k £72.55k £144.46k £80.86k £52.97k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £35.45k £30.30k £33.92k £35.82k £30.13k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £3.77m £3.53m £3.02m £2.91m £2.81m
Long-term investments £9.08m £7.91m £7.79m £7.68m £6.38m
Other assets £2.62m £1.91m £1.82m £1.10m £1.24m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£399.60k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £2.32m £2.73m £2.39m £2.17m £2.01m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 November 2022 148 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 25 November 2022 148 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED AT LIVERPOOL PROBATE REGISTRY ON 20 SEPTEMBER 1993.
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH OF PUPILS OF ST. EDWARDS COLLEGE SANDFIELD PARK LIVERPOOL RECEIVING PRIVATE MUSIC INSTRUMENTAL TUITION AS IN THE OPINION OF THE PROVINCIAL HAVE OBVIOUS ABILITY AND REQUIRE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IN RELATION TO SUCH TUITION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 31 August 2001 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Congregation Of Christian Bros
St Timothy's
Rockwell Road
West Derby
Liverpool
L12 4XY
Phone:
01512280088
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available