HARRY AND GERTRUDE LANDY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 254318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Donations to individuals or organisations

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £19,840
Total expenditure: £25,493

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Canada
  • Israel
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 November 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr ARON LANDY Trustee
THE BARRY AND FRANCIS LANDY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE WILLIAMS FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
BARRY LANDY Trustee
THE WILLIAMS FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE BARRY AND FRANCIS LANDY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE CAMBRIDGE TRADITIONAL JEWISH CONGREGATION TRUST
Received: On time
CAMBRIDGE JEWISH CHAPLAINCY BOARD
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £25.25k £21.86k £23.29k £21.67k £19.84k
Total expenditure £20.68k £30.68k £21.08k £21.43k £25.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
192 GILBERT ROAD
CAMBRIDGE
CB4 3PB
Phone:
01223570417
Website:

No information available