THE SOUTH WALES PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE OF MARK MASTER MASONS BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Provincial Grand Lodge of Mark Master Masons of South Wales Benevolent Fund is governed by both statute (Charities Acts) and the Constitution dated 31 October, 1967. The Benevolent Fund is supported by grants from the Grand Lodge of Mark Master Masons Fund of Benevolence (Charity Number 207610), and contributions from Brethren, Ladies, Lodges and Provinces which may take the form of either don
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 December 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EIRIAN JONES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Herbert Elliott | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alun Howell Thomas | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
John William Hatherley | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jeffery David Williams | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Philip William Davies | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anthony William Seymour MBA | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Charles Evans Harries | Trustee | 22 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
James Richard Bevan | Trustee | 05 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Keith Berwick Ferguson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN ALAN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.47k | £8.54k | £4.00k | £21 | £382 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.53k | £6.66k | £7.09k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31ST OCTOBER 1967
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR THE RELIEF OF SUCH POOR AND DISTRESSED BROTHER MARK MASTER MASONS OR THEIR POOR AND DISTRESSED WIDOWS AND CHILREN OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH MASONIC CHARITIES OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS SOCIETIES AND OBJECTS AS THE PROVINCIAL LODGE SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mark Provincial Office
Bridgend Masonic Hall
Coychurch Road
Bridgend
CF31 2AP
- Phone:
- 02920490555
- Email:
- southwalesmark@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window