LADY ELIZABETH GREY REST FUND

Charity number: 254363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To assist women in the County of Northumberland who are in need of rest and respite towards the cost of a break. The charity exists to help particularly those who are caring for others or who are convalescent.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024

Total income: £674
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Northumberland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 April 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev. Cannon Simon White Chair 14 September 2013
KING EDWARD VI SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST AIDAN, ST JAMES AND ST MARY THE VIRGIN, MORPETH
Received: On time
MORPETH BB HALL YOUTH PROJECT
Recently registered
VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Richard Wheatley Trustee 14 May 2018
None on record
Pauline Young Trustee 09 May 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST AIDAN, ST JAMES AND ST MARY THE VIRGIN, MORPETH
Received: On time
MORPETH DISPENSARY
Received: On time
JOAN MARGARET CAFFREY Trustee 17 November 2014
None on record
Janice Parks Trustee 17 November 2014
None on record
SALLY MARY CAROLINE KEITH Trustee 28 October 2011
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST AIDAN, ST JAMES AND ST MARY THE VIRGIN, MORPETH
Received: On time
MORPETH BB HALL YOUTH PROJECT
Recently registered
NOEL COMMON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £623 £633 £655 £661 £674
Total expenditure £1.90k £680 £400 £920 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 20 March 2025 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2022 13 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2021 18 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 16 March 2021 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE RECTORY
COTTINGWOOD LANE
MORPETH
NE61 1ED
Phone:
01670517716
Website:

No information available