ST LUKE'S HOSPICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Luke's exists to give free, expert care to local people aged 18 and over who have active, progressive and advanced life-threatening illness - with extended support to families and carers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£13,224,141
Donations and legacies | £2.59m | |
Charitable activities | £4.56m | |
Other trading activities | £5.03m | |
Investments | £208.27k | |
Other | £831.39k |
Total expenditure:
£13,869,798
Raising funds | £4.14m | |
Charitable activities | £9.73m | |
Other | £0 |
£233,694 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £4,471,652 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £4.14m | |
Charitable expenditure | £9.73m |
People

284 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
775 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Sheffield City
Governance
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Belton | Chair | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Kathryn Elizabeth Platts | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|||||||
Nicola James | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Jon Wadsley | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Suvira Madan | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Mark Durling | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Angus James Anderson Ridge | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Steven David Ned | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Louisa Harrison-Walker | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Amy Louise Stanbridge | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|||||||
Louise Edwards-Holland | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Lucy Cormack | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Martin James Claude McKervey | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Dr DIANA GREENFIELD | Trustee | 08 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.53m | £12.76m | £13.69m | £11.54m | £13.22m | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.97m | £9.77m | £10.09m | £12.39m | £13.87m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £2.71m | £1.19m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.73m | £3.29m | £3.61m | £3.62m | £4.47m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.64m | £3.86m | £4.03m | £2.03m | £2.59m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £4.26m | £1.64m | £3.50m | £4.69m | £5.03m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.83m | £6.20m | £4.95m | £3.71m | £4.56m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £95.80k | £27.27k | £49.50k | £127.95k | £208.27k | |
|
Income - Other | £706.72k | £1.03m | £1.17m | £980.78k | £831.39k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.33m | £2.06m | £2.66m | £830.42k | £1.39m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.08m | £7.31m | £7.07m | £8.70m | £9.73m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.89m | £2.46m | £3.03m | £3.69m | £4.14m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £101.78k | £100.74k | £98.10k | £98.94k | £125.32k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £11.74k | £4.66k | £16.90k | £24.17k | £24.43k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £7.46m | £6.73m | £6.75m | £6.86m | £10.04m | |
|
Long-term investments | £523.15k | £2.59m | £4.67m | £4.38m | £4.61m | |
|
Other assets | £3.32m | £5.10m | £6.98m | £5.98m | £4.22m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.35m | £2.91m | £3.27m | £3.36m | £2.97m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15TH NOVEMBER 1967 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22 JUNE 1988, 15 OCTOBER 1990, 18 NOVEMBER 1996, 18 DECEMBER 2006. SCHEME DATED 11/2/1998 as amended on 13 Dec 2021 as amended on 13 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS ARE TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION AND IN PARTICULAR:- A ) BY PROVIDING AN ESTABLISHMENT OR ESTABLISHMENTS FOR SICK PERSONS WHERE THEY CAN BE GIVEN THE ACCOMMODATION, ATTENDANCE, MEDICAL CARE AND TREATMENT AND NURSING WHICH BY REASONS OF THEIR SICKNESS THEY REQUIRE; B) BY CONDUCTING, EXPLORING OR ENCOURAGING RESEARCH AND THE EVALUATION OF IMPROVEMENTS IN THE CARE OF THE TERMINALLY ILL PERSON AND THAT PERSON'S CARERS AND RELATIVES AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; C) BY PROVIDING PALLIATIVE CARE IN THE COMMUNITY AND BY PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR THE CARERS AND RELATIVES OF TERMINALLY ILL PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. LUKES HOSPICE
LITTLE COMMON LANE
SHEFFIELD
S11 9NE
- Phone:
- 01142369911
- Email:
- info@hospicesheffield.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window