SUTTON COLDFIELD, FOUR OAKS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arranging meetings for public worship, which includes Bible education and training in Christian living. Preaching the Christian message to the public within the congregation area. Distributing Bibles and other religious literature; also giving pastoral assistance to the congregation and the wider community. All of these services and facilities are provided without charge
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 06 December 1967: Standard registration
- 04 March 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 04 March 2022: Funds transferred to 275946 THE KINGDOM HALL TRUST
- SUTTON COLDFIELD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.52k | £11.39k | £9.62k | £8.00k | £7.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.08k | £35.45k | £12.28k | £8.99k | £8.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 24 July 2020 | 170 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 18 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 JUNE 1997
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE DISSEMINATION OF BIBLE TRUTHS, ORALLY AND BY THE PRINTED PAGE, AND BY MEANS OF DISTRIBUTION OF BIBLES AND THE PRINTING AND PUBLICATION OF BIBLE STUDY HELPS, TRACTS, PAMPHLETS, PAPERS, AND OTHER RELIGIOUS DOCUMENTS
Area of benefit
SUTTON COLDFIELD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window