THE APOSTOLIC NUNCIATURE HOLY SEE-VATICAN EMBASSY

Charity Number: 254540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE CHARITY HOLDS PROPERTY ON BEHALF OF THE HOLY FATHER'S NUNCIO IN GREAT BRITAIN AND USES THIS FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 December 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • APOSTOLIC DELEGATION TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Most Reverend Miguel Maury Buendia Trustee 01 May 2023
None on record
FATHER MARTIN MCCARTHY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
25 Lawnside
LONDON
SE3 9HR
Phone:
07426812065
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available