THE CORPORATION OF THE HALL OF ARTS AND SCIENCES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain the Royal Albert Hall, a Grade I listed building of historical and cultural significance and, through its use, to promote the understanding, appreciation and enjoyment of the Arts and Sciences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£54,363,000
Donations and legacies | £3.25m | |
Charitable activities | £32.48m | |
Other trading activities | £16.66m | |
Investments | £1.98m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£42,692,000
Raising funds | £553.00k | |
Charitable activities | £41.72m | |
Other | £415.00k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £968.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £41.72m | |
Retained for future use | £11.67m |
People

419 Employee(s)
21 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 9 |
£70k to £80k | 8 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 3 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 18 December 1967: Standard registration
- THE ROYAL ALBERT HALL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES MAX BSC HONS | Chair | 19 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Iain Michael Roddam Urquhart | Trustee | 22 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Chris Wise | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ian Alexander Walmsley | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Paul Marsden | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Duncan James Shennan | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|||||
The Honourable Alice Walpole OBE | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS JAMES ROBERT BORWICK | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Richard Harrington | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harry Handelsman | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|||||
NIGEL JONATHON HAMWAY | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Iain Ronald McNay | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Porter | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|||||
JOHN ANTHONY COOPER | Trustee | 18 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stuart William Newey | Trustee | 06 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter B M Lim FCA MBA | Trustee | 22 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Robert Lipson | Trustee | 22 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Harry Ratcliffe FRICS FRSA | Trustee | 31 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
DR MONICA BLOCH PHD | Trustee | 19 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
LEON BAROUKH MA CFA | Trustee | 30 October 2008 |
|
|
||||
Sir MICHAEL DIXON KBE BSC | Trustee | 01 July 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.34m | £16.02m | £24.39m | £43.26m | £54.36m | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.97m | £26.70m | £27.24m | £36.65m | £42.69m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.52m | £2.39m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.71m | £6.85m | £4.83m | £2.87m | £3.25m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £24.20m | £4.76m | £6.03m | £16.20m | £16.66m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £13.13m | £4.33m | £11.13m | £24.05m | £32.48m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £304.00k | £78.00k | £4.00k | £133.00k | £1.98m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £248.00k | £86.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £40.43m | £26.20m | £26.77m | £35.67m | £41.72m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £541.00k | £504.00k | £472.00k | £565.00k | £553.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £239.00k | £0 | £447.00k | £577.00k | £783.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £415.00k | £415.00k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £44.79m | £48.10m | £49.24m | £48.65m | £51.52m | |
|
Long-term investments | £3.27m | £0 | £6.20m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £39.13m | £23.36m | £35.05m | £53.20m | £70.22m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £29.88m | £24.82m | £46.70m | £51.08m | £59.32m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 08/04/1866 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 25/10/1887 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 07/12/1928 AMENDED BY ACT OF PARLIAMENT 27/06/1876 AMENDED BY ACT OF PARLIAMENT 29/07/1927 AMENDED BY ACT OF PARLIAMENT 22/06/1951 AMENDED BY ACT OF PARLIAMENT 03/08/1966
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF ARTS AND SCIENCES IN THE MANNER SET OUT IN THE CHARTERS (SEE RECITALS (7) (8) AND (11E) OF THE ACT OF 1966)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYAL ALBERT HALL
KENSINGTON GORE
LONDON
SW7 2AP
- Phone:
- 020 7959 0505
- Email:
- susang@royalalberthall.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window