SEDGEFIELD DISTRICT CITIZENS' ADVICE BUREAU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
Governance
- 17 January 1968: Standard registration
- 25 January 2007: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 25 January 2007: Funds transferred to 1107261 SEDGEFIELD & DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
- SEDGEFIELD & DISTRICT ADVICE & INFORMATION SERVICE (Working name)
- SEDGEFIELD AND DISTRICT ADVICE AND INFORMATION SERVICE (Working name)
- NEWTON AYCLIFFE AND DISTRICT CITIZEN'S ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £387.24k | £390.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £380.34k | £391.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 09 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 30 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 30 November 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 07 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 07 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 12 APRIL 1978
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN SEDGEFIELD BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
SEDGEFIELD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window