Financial history GUY'S KING'S AND ST THOMAS' HOSPITALS GAZETTE

Charity Number: 254662
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2014
Total gross income £34.27k £34.51k £35.40k £32 £11.41k
Total expenditure £35.64k £34.51k £30.12k £16.41k £12.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A