GUY'S KING'S AND ST THOMAS' HOSPITALS GAZETTE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a journal for the current staff and students plus alumni of Guy's, King's College and St. Thomas's Hospitals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Southwark
Governance
- 23 August 1972: Standard registration
- 05 March 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- GKT GAZETTE (Working name)
- GUY'S HOSPITAL GAZETTE COMMITTEE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.27k | £34.51k | £35.40k | £32 | £11.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.64k | £34.51k | £30.12k | £16.41k | £12.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH JULY 1972 AS AMENDED 2ND MAY 2000.
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE CHARITABLE WORK OF GUY'S HOSPITAL AND GUY'S HOSPITAL MEDICAL SCHOOL BY PUBLISHING AN INDEPENDENT JOURNAL AS A CHRONICLE AND CRITIQUE OF THE WORK OF AND EVENTS IN THE LIFE OF THE SAID HOSPITAL AND SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
GUY'S HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window