Governing document THE ROYAL THEATRICAL SUPPORT TRUST

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/11/1967 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/04/1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/09/2002 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26/10/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE "OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOSTERING AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE, EXPERIENCE AND APPRECIATION OF THEATRE AND DRAMA AT EVERY LEVEL OF PERFORMANCE AND AUDIENCE, INCLUDING: (1) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT OF ALL KINDS: (A) TO NEW OR ESTABLISHED THEATRE COMPANIES; (B) FOR TRANSFERS AND TOURS OF THEATRICAL WORKS OF DISTINCTION TO ENABLE WIDER PUBLIC ACCESS; (C) TO EMERGING THEATRE PERFORMERS, PLAYWRIGHTS AND OTHER THEATRE PRACTITIONERS, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO PRODUCERS, DIRECTORS, DESIGNERS, MANAGERS AND TECHNICIANS; AND (D) FOR TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN THE THEATRICAL ARTS; AND (2) THE FOSTERING AND PROMOTION OF THE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE, EXPERIENCE AND APPRECIATION OF THE WORKS OF SHAKESPEARE AND OTHER MAJOR INTERNATIONALLY RENOWNED DRAMATISTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.