THALIAN THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Amateur dramatic and musical theatre society performing shows and musical entertainment in local theatres and function halls
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,200 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 24 March 1969: Standard registration
- THE WELWYN THALIANS (Previous name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMANDA SAYERS | Chair | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin David Lester | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colleen Town | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Louise Bateman | Trustee | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mary Angela Monaghan | Trustee | 26 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alison Clare Downes | Trustee | 23 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
TAMMY MARIE WALL | Trustee | 23 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY DAVID JONATHAN SPINKS | Trustee | 10 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.54k | £28.50k | £16.55k | £31.23k | £35.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.60k | £11.73k | £15.59k | £32.62k | £34.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £1.00k | £1.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES AS AMENDED 4TH FEBRUARY 1969 as amended on 15 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER THE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC AND DRAMA AND FOR THIS PURPOSE (A) TO PRODUCE, PLAY AND READ OPERATIC, DRAMATIC AND OTHER WORKS; (B) TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN SUITABLE PREMISES THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NONE SPECIFIED
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 ABBOTS CLOSE
DATCHWORTH
KNEBWORTH
SG3 6TA
- Phone:
- 07900474085
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window