THE BRITISH BIOPHYSICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The BBS continues to support academic activities in the field of Biophysics. This involves supporting conferences and attendance of University postgraduate students at such conferences, primarily in the UK but also in Europe and the US.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 March 1968: Standard registration
- BBS (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof. John Sanderson | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ann Maryna Dixon | Trustee | 13 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Olwyn Byron | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR Tharin Blumenschein de Almeida | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.97k | £6.61k | £26.34k | £7.32k | £10.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.80k | £11.24k | £3.17k | £15.97k | £6.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 June 2023 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 June 2023 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REVISED RULES ADOPTED 15TH APRIL 1966
Charitable objects
THE SOCIETY IS INSTITUTED SOLELY FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SCIENCE OF BIOPHYSICS, THAT IS, THE STUDY OF THE FUNCTIONING AND STRUCTURE OF LIVING ORGANISMS VIEWED FROM A PHYSICAL STANDPOINT AND THE APPLICATION OF PHYSICAL AND PHYSICO-CHEMICAL TECHNIQUES TO BIOLOGICAL PROBLEMS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
University of East Anglia
Norwich Research Park
Earlham Road
Norwich
NR4 7TJ
- Phone:
- 02476150037
- Email:
- ann.dixon@warwick.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window