Trustees THE VILLAGE HALL (FELTON)
Charity Number: 254763

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eileen Cameron | Chair | 22 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Martin James Parker | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALAN RAMSBOTTOM | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Isobel Walton | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Richard Fitzroy Nailer | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Allan | Trustee | 29 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Rushby | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARION CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.