Financial history ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY OF JOHN AND WILLIAM EDWARDS

Charity number: 254785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £484 £484 £484 £484 £484
Total expenditure £418 £457 £396 £374 £352
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A