THE WELSH PARAPLEGIC AND TETRAPLEGIC ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide coaching & financial support for wheelchair atheletes in Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 15 January 1968: Standard registration
- WPTSA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terence O'DONNELL | Trustee | 01 January 1995 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £232 | £168 | £19 | £309 | £707 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.40k | £1.66k | £0 | £432 | £272 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 19 DECEMBER 1967 AS VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 31 AUGUST 1978
Charitable objects
(A) THE AFTER CARE OF PARAPLEGICS AND TETRAPLEGICS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN PATIENTS AT HOSPITALS IN WALES. (B) THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF THEIR LIFE BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ORGANISED COMPETITIVE GAMES, RECREATION, OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION. (C) TO SUPPORT CHARITABLE CLUBS HAVING AMONG THEIR OBJECTS THE RELIEF OF THE BENEFICIARIES IN THE MANNER DEFINED IN PARAGRAPHS (A) AND (B). (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE RULES CLAUSE 2(I), (II), (III)).
Area of benefit
THE PRINCIPALITY OF WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 ELGAR CRESCENT
LLANRUMNEY
CARDIFF
CF3 5RU
- Phone:
- 02920914685
- Email:
- t.odonnell2@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window