THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF BUXTON HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide comforts to patients in The Cavendish Hospital Buxton and clinic patients and visitors to MIU at Buxton Cottage Hospital, also supporting patients of Buxton Hospitals in the community requiring aftercare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 25 March 1969: Standard registration
- LEAGUE OF FRIENDS BUXTON HOSPITAL (Working name)
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF BUXTON COTTAGE HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Evie-Jean Collier | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diane Cobb | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.98k | £1.14k | £56 | £69 | £1.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.57k | £1.41k | £1.97k | £1.96k | £3.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 November 2020 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH JANUARY 1969, AS AMENDED ON 30TH JUNE 2003
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL AND OTHER PEOPLE WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, AND GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.NOW INCLUDING MATERNITY
Area of benefit
BUXTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Barson Grove
BUXTON
SK17 9SB
- Phone:
- 07837935777
- Email:
- juliekarenc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window