CHRISTIANS AT WORK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christians at Work exists to promote honesty, morality, integrity and friendship in the workplace by encouraging Christian men and women to live out their faith at work and thereby setting a positive example in their working community. It achieves this by encouraging, equipping and supporting Christian fellowship, witness and evangelism at work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Canada
- France
- Germany
- Guernsey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 06 February 1968: Standard registration
- 29 January 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.95k | £72.70k | £53.49k | £38.27k | £28.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.26k | £57.55k | £54.34k | £52.93k | £51.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 18 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 18 September 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 29 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 29 July 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 07 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 07 September 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/03/1974 AS AMENDED ON 02/03/1985 AS AMENDED ON 01/07/2003 AS AMENDED ON 17/03/2012
Charitable objects
1. TO WORK FOR THE EXTENSION OF CHRIST'S KINGDOM IN EVERY PLACE OF WORK. 2. TO SUPPORT ENCOURAGE AND EQUIP CHRISTIANS AT WORK AND IN THE WORLD AT LARGE TOWARDS EXEMPLARY WORKING, PERSONAL EVANGELISM, FELLOWSHIP AND HOLY LIVING. 3. TO UNITE SUCH CHRISTIANS IN A LARGER FELLOWSHIP AND IN JOINT ACTIVITIES. 4. TO PROVIDE INFORMATION, LITERATURE AND OTHER FACILITIES TO THE SAME END AND TO EXCHANGE IDEAS AND SHARE EXPERIENCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window