Financial history MISSION HALL AND RECREATION ROOM

Charity number: 254892
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.30k £2.06k £6.68k £5.14k £5.11k
Total expenditure £4.99k £4.67k £6.65k £7.24k £5.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A