Accounts and annual returns THE FEDERATED PENSION SCHEMES BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity Number: 254934
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 12 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 19 November 2014 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2012 17 September 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 25 April 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required