I A P S ABERFAN DISASTER FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and training in the Aberfan area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 05 February 1968: Standard registration
- 22 September 2011: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £487 | £474 | £606 | £486 | £31 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 23 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 29 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 17 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECALARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 OCTOBER 1967
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF ALL PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED AS A RESULT OF THE ABERFAN DISASTER AND ARE THEREBY IN NEED. 2) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO WERE INHABITANTS OF ABERFAN AND ITS IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD ON 21 OCTOBER 1966 AND IN PARTICULAR FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN WHO WERE ON THE 21 OCTOBER 1966 RESIDENT IN ABERFAN.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window