THE CHICHESTER HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHICHESTER HALL, WITLEY, SURREY IS THERE TO ENHANCE THE COMMUNITY LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF WITLEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING A VENUE FOR THEIR GENERAL PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION AND FOR THEIR SOCIAL, MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT. THE PRINCIPAL ACTIVITY BEING THE PROVISION OF A VILLAGE HALL WHICH IS AVAILABLE FOR HIRE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 15 January 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Lewis | Chair | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Tugwell | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shereen Brandon | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Beard | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tim Beard | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sam Udall | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Bayliss | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Becky Latham | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Brett-Field | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Pusey | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bacon | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tim Kendall | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE KING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETRA WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.30k | £51.56k | £51.56k | £25.78k | £46.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.93k | £37.15k | £37.15k | £30.56k | £60.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £470 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £43.71k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 11 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 11 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 19 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 19 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 16 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8TH FEBRUARY 1935 AND SCHEME OF THE 7TH NOVERMBER 1947 AND RESOLUTION DATED 3 JUNE 2014
Charitable objects
"FOR THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION AND SOCIAL MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS LECTURES CLASSES ENTERTAINMENTS OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WITLEY (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE PARISH") AND SURROUNDING AREAS".
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WITLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLLY HEDGES
WHEELER LANE
WITLEY
GODALMING
GU8 5QU
- Phone:
- 07956617695
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window