CHURCH ESTATE AND HEADBOROUGH CHARITY

Charity number: 254975
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To maintain Church House, Dereham to provide a Parish Hall & Parish Office for St Nicholas Church & a hall & meeting room for wider community use. To help maintain the fabric of St Nicholas Church & support its Mission & Ministry where funds allow.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £25,151
Total expenditure: £41,100

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 February 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE HEADBOROUGH TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Bower Trustee 06 April 2025
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS, DEREHAM
Received: On time
Tim Eccleshall Trustee 28 April 2024
THE FRAGILE X SOCIETY
Received: On time
MID-NORFOLK SINGERS
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS, DEREHAM
Received: On time
THE FRAGILE X SOCIETY
Received: On time
Zane Martin Hajee Trustee 28 April 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS, DEREHAM
Received: On time
Tracy Lea Trustee 01 May 2023
None on record
SHEILA HANMER Trustee 01 May 2023
THE FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS CHURCH DEREHAM
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS, DEREHAM
Received: On time
Ann Eccleshall Trustee 01 May 2023
None on record
Tom Cross Trustee 01 May 2023
None on record
Marion Morgan Trustee 01 May 2022
None on record
Jonathan Mark Thorpe Trustee 03 April 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS, DEREHAM
Received: On time
Julie Benstead Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
Susanne Warner Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
Rev PAUL CUBITT Trustee 01 May 2020
NORTH BRECKLAND YOUTH FOR CHRIST
Received: On time
CHARITY OF THOMAS BULLOCK
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS CHURCH DEREHAM
Received: On time
Lynn Hearn Trustee 01 May 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS, DEREHAM
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £18.21k £10.17k £19.35k £14.70k £25.15k
Total expenditure £10.47k £6.44k £5.03k £8.26k £41.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CHURCH HOUSE
CHURCH STREET
DEREHAM
NR19 1DN
Phone:
01362693143
Website:

No information available