Financial history KENT FARMERS BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 254983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £2.74k £1.99k £1.85k £2.14k £2.75k
Total expenditure £1.00k £4.00k £1.00k £1.00k £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A