SAREHOLE MILL RECREATION GROUND (FOSTER FOR BOTANICAL GARDENS ETC)

Charity Number: 254995
Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of public open space for healthful recreation and a museum that will advance education through its day to day operation

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £16,652

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 April 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SAREHOLE MILL RECREATION GROUND (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BIRMINGHAM CITY COUNCIL Trustee
ERDINGTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days
PUBLIC PARK AND PLEASURE GROUND BIRMINGHAM SELLY OAK PARK
Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
WILLIAM WALTER HINDE FOR OPEN SPACE
Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
FARM PARK
Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days
GEORGE CADBURY FOR PUBLIC PARK
Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
BURBURY PARK
Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
PUBLIC PARK AT HARBORNE
Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
PUBLIC OPEN SPACE
Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
MOSELEY ROAD COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
THE ELFORD ESTATE CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
VICTORIA COMMON
Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
KING GEORGE'S FIELD
Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £21.49k £22.35k £29.90k £15.43k £16.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 April 2023 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 March 2021 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 Woodcock Street
BIRMINGHAM
B7 4BL
Phone:
0121 675 2490
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available