THE BOURNEMOUTH ASSOCIATION FOR THE CARE OF THE ELDERLY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide financial assistance to needy elderly in the Bournemouth Borough
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bournemouth
Governance
- 08 February 1968: Standard registration
- 14 January 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 14 January 2018: Funds transferred to 1055056 HELP AND CARE
- B A C E (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.64k | £17.52k | £11.98k | £2.32k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.70k | £16.74k | £1.50k | £2.96k | £2.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 06 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 15 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 02 November 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 05 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26TH MARCH 1957 AS AMENDED 27TH APRIL 1966
Charitable objects
TO CO-ORDINATE AND, BY MUTUAL ASSOCIATION,CO-OPERATION AND JOINT EFFORT, PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN BOURNEMOUTH.
Area of benefit
BOURNEMOUTH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window