THE PERRY WATLINGTON TRUST

Charity number: 255014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objective of the charity is to provide benefit to sick people in the county of Essex

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £37,922
Total expenditure: £38,740

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 March 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charles Ashton Chair
None on record
Guy Nicholas Buckingham Varney Trustee 14 May 2020
None on record
Claire Monica Oxley Fisher Trustee 01 February 2015
None on record
GEORGE HENRY DE MONTMORENCY CARBUTT Trustee 22 January 2012
THE BARBARA PRICE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
CHARLES NICHOLAS GOOCH Trustee 22 January 2012
HENRY SMITH'S CHARITY (TOLLESHUNT D'ARCY ESTATE)
Received: On time
AMANDA PAMELA GERRY Trustee
THE LIONEL LYSTER 1980 MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
CLAIRE COTTRELL DL Trustee
HENRY SMITH'S CHARITY (TOLLESHUNT D'ARCY ESTATE)
Received: On time
ESSEX YOUTH TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £37.63k £45.74k £13.99k £43.26k £37.92k
Total expenditure £32.30k £21.30k £32.30k £28.55k £38.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 05 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 March 2021 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 12 March 2021 132 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Stour House
Court Street
Nayland
Suffolk
CO6 4JL
Phone:
07785395572
Website:

No information available