NASH CONCERT SOCIETY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the development of musical appreciation Advancement of musical education in general
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 February 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL JOHN LEWIS | Chair | 28 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Sir Stanley Burnton | Trustee | 10 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Sally Hilary Marks Groves MBE | Trustee | 10 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
AMELIA FREEDMAN CBE | Trustee | 28 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
RODNEY SLATFORD OBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LADY PRIMROSE BELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM LYNE CBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £167.72k | £76.50k | £158.88k | £184.02k | £195.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £186.28k | £86.88k | £170.89k | £180.86k | £191.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 February 2025 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 February 2025 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 April 2024 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 April 2024 | 89 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24TH JANUARY 1968
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC MUSICAL EDUCATION IN GENERAL AND IN PARTICULAR A) BY PROCURING SPONSORING OR ASSISTING THE PERFORMANCE OF MUSICAL WORKS OF HIGH QUALITY. (FOR FURTHER OBECTS SEE DECLARATION OF TRUST)
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 CEDARS CLOSE
LONDON
NW4 1TR
- Phone:
- 020 8203 3025
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window