SOUTH-WEST SURREY MOBILE PHYSIOTHERAPY SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A physiotherapy service to meet the needs of people in the village communities of SW Surrey. In addition to working from Shere, Send and Horsley surgeries, Mobile Physio undertakes home visits for the housebound and elderly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Total income includes £125,220 from 1 government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 29 February 1968: Standard registration
- 14 December 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 14 December 2019: Funds transferred to 1176821 SOUTH-WEST SURREY MOBILE PHYSIOTHERAPY SERVICE
- MOBILE PHYSIO (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £151.50k | £147.84k | £141.61k | £150.36k | £154.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.04k | £139.91k | £170.80k | £158.06k | £132.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £116.10k | £0 | £117.50k | £118.48k | £125.22k | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.00k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 14 August 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 14 August 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 29 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 09 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2017
(These accounts |
09 November 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 24 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 24 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 2ND JANUARY 1997
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM DISEASE, ACCIDENT OR PHYSICAL DISABILITY AND UNABLE OTHERWISE SATISFACTORILY TO OBTAIN SUCH CARE NURSING AND ATTENTION AS MAY BE REQUIRED.
Area of benefit
FORMER BOROUGHS OF GUILDFORD AND GOLDAMING, FORMER URBAN DISTRICTS OF LEATHERHEAD, WOKING, FARNHAM AND HASLEMERE (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE SCHEME).
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window